FL S0102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a health insurer or a health maintenance organization from retroactively denying a claim under specified circumstances; exempting certain Medicaid managed care plans, etc.
Title
Payment of Health Care Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/14/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/21/17, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0579 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |