FL S0100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "utility worker"; providing for reclassification of certain offenses committed against a utility worker; amending provisions relating to the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, to incorporate the amendment made to s. 784.07, F.S., in references thereto, etc.
Title
Assault or Battery On a Utility Worker
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2013-09-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 10/08/13, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 644 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/100 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0100/BillText/Filed/HTML |