FL S0100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from using a job applicant's credit report or credit history to make certain hiring, compensation, or other employment decisions; providing specific situations where an employer may use such information; providing for a plaintiff to post a bond to indemnify the defendant for damages, including attorney fees, in certain situations, etc.
Title
Employment Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/15/13, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Filed |