FL S0100 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that a physician refer a minor to an appropriate specialist for screening for autism spectrum disorder under certain circumstances. Requires that certain insurers and health maintenance organizations provide direct patient access to an appropriate specialist for screening for or evaluation or diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder. Requires certain insurance policies and health maintenance organization contracts to provide a minimum number of visits per year for screening for or evaluation or diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autism

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-14 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/15/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-04-11 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/14/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-04-01 Now in Budget -SJ 308
2011-03-30 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-29 CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 308
2011-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-22 Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 269
2011-03-17 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 19
2010-11-29 Referred to Health Regulation; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 19
2010-11-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1431 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6276686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131098Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback