FL S0096 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "disabled veteran"; providing that disabled veterans receiving certain federal educational assistance benefits are eligible to receive an award for the remaining cost of tuition and fees at state universities and Florida College System institutions, etc.
Title
Educational Opportunities for Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 01/15/20, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/96 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/96/BillText/Filed/HTML |