FL S0096 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the required health education in public schools to include information regarding the dangers and signs of human trafficking; authorizing a student to opt out of a specified portion of the health education under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking Education in Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Now in Education |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/09/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-09-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 09/12/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-08-09 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/96 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/96/BillText/Filed/HTML |