FL S0096 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to provide for the election of the Commissioner of Education and the inclusion of the commissioner as a member of the Cabinet, etc.
Title
Commissioner of Education
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 17 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/09/12, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 17 | |
2011-08-29 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/96 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0096/BillText/Filed/HTML |