FL S0092 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Second Chance for Children Act"; providing that a juvenile offender who was 17 years of age or younger at the time of committing one or more nonhomicide offenses and who was sentenced to 10 or more years of imprisonment may be eligible for a reduced or suspended sentence; providing that the juvenile offender may petition the court after a specified age for a hearing to reduce or suspend the sentence; setting forth the eligibility criteria to reduce or suspend a sentence; authorizing the juvenile offender to petition for subsequent sentencing hearings if the court does not reduce or suspend the juvenile offender's sentence, etc.
Title
Reducing or Suspending the Sentence of a Juvenile Offender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 01/24/12, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 99 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 17 | |
2011-11-17 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2011-11-17 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 108 | |
2011-11-16 | Now in Budget -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-11-03 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-10-20 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/03/11, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 17 | |
2011-08-29 | Filed |