FL S0086 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception from a certain requirement for lands to be classified as agricultural for taxation purposes; requiring that land jointly used for commercial nonagricultural purposes and bona fide agricultural purposes directly related to apiculture be classified as agricultural, etc.
Title
Agricultural Land Classification and Assessment
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/86 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0086/BillText/Filed/HTML |