FL S0080 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 37
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that a direct primary care agreement does not constitute insurance and is not subject to the Florida Insurance Code; specifying that entering into a direct primary care agreement does not constitute the business of insurance and is not subject to the code, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Primary Care Agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 37
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted HB 37
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/24/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-10-12SenateNow in Health Policy
2017-10-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-10SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 10/10/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 09/13/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H37 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-89

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62427Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback