FL S0080 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3555 (Ch. 2015-218)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Michael and Patricia Rardin by the North Broward Hospital District; providing for an appropriation to compensate Michael and Patricia Rardin for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of the North Broward Hospital District; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Michael and Patricia Rardin by the North Broward Hospital District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3555 (Ch. 2015-218)
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted CS/HB 3555
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-21SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2015-04-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-04-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-31SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-03-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2015-03-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-24SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2015-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/24/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-19SenateNow in Judiciary
2015-03-19SenateRecommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2014-12-03SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2014-07-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H3555 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-218

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback