FL S0076 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Special Master On Claim Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Jamiyah Mitchell, Latricia Mitchell, and Jerald Mitchell by the South Broward Hospital District; providing an appropriation to compensate Latricia Mitchell and Jerald Mitchell, individually and as legal guardians of Jamiyah Mitchell, for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of the South Broward Hospital District; providing a limitation on the payment of compensation and attorney fees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Jamiyah Mitchell, Latricia Mitchell, and Jerald Mitchell/South Broward Hospital District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-09-21SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Health Policy; Rules
2021-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6519 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback