FL S0072 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates Karen W. Stripling for damages sustained as a result of a breach of contract by the Department of Education. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/Karen W. Stripling/Department of Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 18 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 18 | |
2010-08-02 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/72 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0072/BillText/Filed/HTML |