FL S0072 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/CS/HJR 37 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HJR 37 (Passed) -SJ 00742
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/CS/HJR 37 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HJR 37 (Passed) -SJ 00742
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes the creation of Section 28 of Article I of the State Constitution, relating to health care services.
Title
Health Care Services [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/CS/HJR 37 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HJR 37 (Passed) -SJ 00742 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00687; Was taken up -SJ 00692; Amendment(s) adopted (900110) -SJ 00692; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00692 | |
2010-04-15 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00598; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Rules -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-19 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00278 | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 -SJ 00278 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-08 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00190 | |
2010-03-04 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00234; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00017; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/18/10, 8:00 am, 412-K --Temporarily postponed; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/18/10, 8:00 am, 412-K --Temporarily postponed | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Rules | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0037 (Similar To) 2010-05-20 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State