FL S0068 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 163
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 163
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the membership of the Council on Homelessness to include a representative of the Florida Housing Coalition and the Secretary of the Department of Elderly Affairs or his or her designee; increasing the maximum amount of grant awards per continuum of care lead agency; specifying the purposes of a continuum of care; requiring each continuum of care, pursuant to federal law, to designate a collaborative applicant that is responsible for submitting the continuum of care funding application for the designated catchment area to the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, etc.
Title
Homelessness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 163 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Substituted HB 163 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/22/19, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H163 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-44
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 6225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 6227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 623 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 6265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 6275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |