FL S0050 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Leonard Cure; providing an appropriation to compensate him for being wrongfully incarcerated for 16 years; directing the Chief Financial Officer to draw a warrant payable directly to Mr. Cure; requiring the Chief Financial Officer to pay the directed funds without requiring that Mr. Cure sign a liability release; providing for the waiver of certain tuition and fees for Mr. Cure; prohibiting funds awarded under this act to Mr. Cure from being used or paid for attorney or lobbying fees, etc.
Title
Relief of Leonard Cure by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6505 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/50 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/50/BillText/Filed/HTML |