FL S0048 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Barney Brown, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 38 years; providing an appropriation to compensate Mr. Brown for his wrongful incarceration; directing the Chief Financial Officer to draw a warrant; providing that the act does not waive certain defenses or increase the state's liability; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Barney Brown by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3507 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/48 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0048/BillText/Filed/HTML |