FL S0046 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3525 (Ch. 2016-269)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3525 (Ch. 2016-269)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Melvin and Alma Colindres by the City of Miami; providing for an appropriation to compensate them for the wrongful death of their son, Kevin Colindres, which occurred as a result of the negligence of police officers of the City of Miami; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Melvin and Alma Colindres by the City of Miami
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3525 (Ch. 2016-269) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 3525 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-28 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/26/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-07-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3525 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-269