FL S0046 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates William Dillon, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 27 years and exonerated by a court after DNA testing. Directs the Chief Financial Officer to draw a warrant for the purchase of an annuity. Provides for a waiver of certain tuition and fees. Provides conditions for payment. Provides that the act does not waive certain defenses or increase the state's liability, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/William Dillon/State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-04 | In Messages | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/11 -SJ 830 | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Rules read 1st time -SJ 338 | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 324 | |
2011-03-30 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 324 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/29/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-21 | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 236 | |
2011-03-18 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 253 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 17 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 17 | |
2010-08-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0023 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration