FL S0044 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Cristina Alvarez and George Patnode; providing appropriations to compensate them for the death of their son, Nicholas Patnode, a minor, due to the negligence of the Department of Health, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Cristina Alvarez and George Patnode by the Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 6501
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted HB 6501
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (351934)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-05SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-23SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2018-02-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/21/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-22SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-22SenateRecommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-08-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6501 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-162

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback