FL S0042 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3547 (Ch. 2015-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Javier Soria by Palm Beach County; providing for an appropriation to compensate him for injuries sustained as a result of negligence by an employee of Palm Beach County; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and cost, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Javier Soria by Palm Beach County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3547 (Ch. 2015-216)
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted CS/HB 3547
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-20SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2015-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-24SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-23SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateNow in Community Affairs
2015-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-02-17SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/17/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-02-09SenateNow in Judiciary
2015-02-09SenateRecommendation: Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills
2014-12-03SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2014-07-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H3547 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-216

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback