FL S0042 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates Eric Brody for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of the Broward County Sheriff's Office. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs related to the claim against the Broward County Sheriff's Office. Provides legislative intent to prohibit a waiver of lien interests held by the state. Requires that the guardianship pay any such liens before distributing funds to the claimant. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Eric Brody/Broward County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-06 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1981 | |
2011-05-05 | In Messages | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/05/11 | |
2011-04-28 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-26 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 568 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/15/11, 9:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-04-07 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 461 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 17 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 17 | |
2010-08-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1151 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0057 () 2010-12-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 11
H0525 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0057 () 2010-12-09 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 11
H0525 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration