FL S0040 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 6535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa; providing an appropriation to compensate the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa for Dr. Aversa's death as a result of the negligence of the Department of Transportation; requiring the Executive Office of the Governor to establish spending authority from unappropriated trust fund balances of the department for compensation to the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa by the Department of Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 6535
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 6535
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-22SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-22SenateRecommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6535 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-165

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback