FL S0032 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Christeia Jones, as guardian of Logan Grant, Denard Maybin, Jr., and Lanard Maybin; providing an appropriation to compensate them for injuries and damages sustained as a result of an automobile accident caused by Trooper Raul Umana, an employee of the Florida Highway Patrol, a division of the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing a limitation on the payment of attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of Christeia Jones by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Also referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6515 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/32 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/32/BillText/Filed/HTML |