FL S0030 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides relief for Amie Draiemann Stephenson, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Christian Darby Stephenson, deceased, and Hailey Morgan Stephenson and Christian Darby Stephenson, II, as surviving minor children of the decedent. Compensates them for the wrongful death of Christian Darby Stephenson, which was due in part to the negligence of the Department of Transportation. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/Stephenson/Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 16 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 16 | |
2010-08-02 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/30 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0030/BillText/Filed/HTML |