FL S0022 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Jennifer Wohlgemuth by the Pasco County Sheriff's Office; providing for an appropriation to compensate Jennifer Wohlgemuth, whose injuries were due to the negligence of an employee of the Pasco County Sheriff's Office; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM:
Title
Relief of Jennifer Wohlgemuth by the Pasco County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-03-07 | In Messages | |
2012-03-07 | Passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 5 -SJ 951 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 951 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/12 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 699 | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 699 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/27/12, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-22 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 672 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 14 | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 14 | |
2011-07-27 | Filed |