FL S0018 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa; providing an appropriation to compensate the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa for Dr. Aversa's death as result of the negligence of the Department of Transportation; requiring the Executive Office of the Governor to establish spending authority from unappropriated trust fund balances of the department for compensation to the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa; providing for attorney fees and costs; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of the Estate of Dr. Sherrill Lynn Aversa by the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Transportation; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/18 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0018/BillText/Filed/HTML |