FL S0014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Dennis Darling, Sr., and Wendy Smith, parents of Devaughn Darling, deceased; providing an appropriation to compensate them for the loss of their son, Devaughn Darling, whose death occurred while he was engaged in football preseason training on the Florida State University campus; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief of Dennis Darling, Sr., and Wendy Smith/State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 13 | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 13 | |
2011-07-26 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/14 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0014/BillText/Filed/HTML |