FL S0012 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Mark T. Sawicki and his wife, Sharon L. Sawicki, individually, by the City of Tallahassee; providing for an appropriation to compensate them for injuries sustained by Mark T. Sawicki as a result of the negligence of the City of Tallahassee; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM:
Title
Relief of Mark T. and Sharon L. Sawicki by the City of Tallahassee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2012-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0243 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Select Committee on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/12 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0012/BillText/Filed/HTML |