FL S0002 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Approved by Governor -SJ 759
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Approved by Governor -SJ 759
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of William Dillon, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 27 years; providing an appropriation to compensate William Dillon for his wrongful incarceration; directing the Chief Financial Officer to draw a warrant for the purchase of an annuity; providing for a waiver of certain tuition and fees; providing conditions for payment; providing that the act does not waive certain defenses or increase the state's liability; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs; providing that certain benefits are void upon any future finding that William Dillon is not innocent of the alleged crime, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief of William Dillon by State of Florida
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#908 (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#908 (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Approved by Governor -SJ 759 | |
2012-03-01 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 765 | |
2012-03-01 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (694861) -SJ 727 | |
2012-02-27 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-24 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 5 -HJ 823 | |
2012-02-24 | Read 3rd time -HJ 823 | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 141 -HJ 793 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 687 | |
2012-01-11 | In Messages | |
2012-01-10 | Immediately certified -SJ 7 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 13 | |
2012-01-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/12 | |
2011-12-07 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 113 | |
2011-11-17 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-11-16 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 113 | |
2011-11-07 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 11/16/11, 11:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-03 | Now in Rules -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-03 | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-01 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 13 | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 13 | |
2011-05-26 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |