FL H9083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item s. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item s. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Gulf Coast State College - Nursing/Hospital Simulation Laboratory Complex.
Title
Gulf Coast State College - Nursing/Hospital Simulation Laboratory Complex
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item s. 197) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-22 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed |