FL H9039 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1688 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1688 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 23-25, 2014, as the 20th Annual "Delta Days at the Florida Capitol."
Title
Delta Sigma Theta Sorority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1688 (Adopted) |
2014-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2014-03-24 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1688 (Similar To) 2014-03-20 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9039 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/9039 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/9039/BillText/Filed/PDF |