FL H9015 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates week of April 27-May 4, 2014, as "Days of Remembrance" & April 28, 2014, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in State of Florida.
Title
Holocaust Remembrance Day & Week
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. Joseph Gibbons [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] | Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2014-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/9015 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/9015/BillText/Filed/PDF |