FL H8063 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1830 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes March 31-April 2, 2019, as the 25th annual "Delta Days at the Capitol."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delta Days at the Capitol

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseAdopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1830 (Adopted)
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2019-04-18HouseIntroduced
2019-04-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1830 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8063 (Adopted)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback