FL H8031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes October 15, 2024, as "National Pregnancy & Infant Loss Remembrance Day."
Title
National Pregnancy and Infancy Loss Remembrance Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2024-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/8031 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/8031/BillText/Filed/PDF |