FL H8021 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates March 21, 2023, as "Persian New Year's Day" in Florida, celebrates historical & cultural significance of Norooz, & expresses appreciation for contributions of Iranian Americans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persian New Year's Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30HouseAdopted by Publication
2023-03-30HouseRead 2nd time
2023-03-30HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2023-03-28House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-27HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback