FL H8013 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes March 26, 2019, as "Florida Gulf Coast University Day" in Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Gulf Coast University Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAdopted by Publication
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced
2019-03-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1828 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8013 (Adopted)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback