FL H7173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain member enrolled in FRS is vested in the pension plan after 10 years of creditable service; provides for compulsory membership in FRS Investment Plan for certain employees; prohibits members of Elected Officers' Class from joining Senior Management Service Class after specified date; prohibits an elected official eligible for membership in Elected Officers' Class from enrolling in Senior Management Service Class or in Senior Management Service Optional Annuity Program; closing Senior Management Optional Annuity Program to new members after specified date; increases service time required to qualify for disability benefits to 10 years for certain members; requires certain employees initially enrolled in FRS on or after specified date to be compulsory members of investment plan; provides certain members with specified time to choose participation in pension plan or investment plan.
Title
Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54) |
2014-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 10 |
2014-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/10/14, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-04-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0184 (Similar To) 2014-03-20 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
S1114 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
H5005 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-54, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51)
H7181 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
S1114 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
H5005 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-54, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51)
H7181 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2014-54)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
238 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/7173 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/7173/BillText/Filed/PDF |