FL H7153 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to support or initiate action that would allow local governments to fully implement programs designed to encourage voluntary energy conservation & efficiency, renewable energy, & wind resistance improvements by homeowners & businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualifying Improvements to Real Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-28 In Messages
2011-04-28 Read 2nd time -HJ 887
2011-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11
2011-03-31 Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 393
2011-03-29 On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2011-03-28 Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 339
2011-03-25 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback