FL H7115 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to judicial census commissions.
Title
Judicial Census Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#190 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-15 | In Messages | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 628 | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11 | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 314 | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |