FL H7113 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of public records exemption for information that identifies donor or prospective donor of donation made for benefit of publicly owned performing arts center if donor desires to remain anonymous.
Title
OGSR/Donor or Prospective Donor/Publicly Owned Performing Arts Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#182 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#182 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Chapter No. 2017-68 | |
2017-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7002 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-04-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7002 (Same As) 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7113 (Ch. 2017-68)