FL H7113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to restricting practice of law by retired justice, requirement to appoint Clerk of Supreme Court, requirement that clerk have office in Supreme Clerk Building, requirement that clerk perform duties as directed by court, & provision by which rules of court supersede statutes.
Title
Supreme Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#213 (Y: 79 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-20 | In Messages | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 650 | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 627 | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11 | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 5 -HJ 314 | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |