FL H7109 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act of exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of Lifeline Assistance Plan participants; provides penalty for intentional disclosure of confidential & exempt information by officer or employee of PSC.
Title
OGSR/Lifeline Assistance Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#812 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#812 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1718 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1149 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities -SJ 1149 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities -SJ 837 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 837 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 747 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 746 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 699 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 671 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 571 | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced -HJ 542 | |
2012-02-08 | Filed |