FL H7093 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-119
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adopting the 2018 version of the Internal Revenue Code; revising the definition of the term "adjusted federal income" relating to adjustments related to federal acts; requiring the Department of Revenue to make a certain examination, monitor guidance by the Internal Revenue Service, conduct workshops, and develop a certain process regarding the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act of 2017; requiring the department to consult with the Revenue Estimating Conference in developing required reports, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Income Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#894 (Y: 81 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#757 (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-119
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 11
2018-03-09SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (334833) 1007
2018-03-09SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-09HousePassed as amended; YEAS 81 NAYS 26 1130
2018-03-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (903866) 1129
2018-03-09HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (334833)
2018-03-08HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-08SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 901
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (903866) 900
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 502
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations 734
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HousePassed as amended; YEAS 75 NAYS 35
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (691223)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S502 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7093

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22063Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback