FL H7065 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revising a short title provision; exempting state employees from specified travel expense provisions when traveling under the Emergency Management Assistance Compact pursuant to a request for assistance from another state under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#782 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2014-04-28SenateReceived
2014-04-28SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2014-04-28SenateIn Messages
2014-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2014-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2014-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2014-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (887703)
2014-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2014-04-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14
2014-04-23HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2014-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14
2014-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-04-15HouseCS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
2014-04-14HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-04-11HouseCS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2014-04-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/11/14, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2014-03-05HouseReferred to Economic Affairs Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1326 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
252921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2529335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback