FL H7059 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits appellate jurisdiction of circuit courts to appeals from final administrative orders of local code enforcement boards & other reviews & appeals expressly provided by law; specifies that public defenders shall take county court appeals; authorizes county court to certify question to district court of appeal in final judgment that is appealable to circuit court; authorizes DCA to review certain questions certified by county court; removes provision relating to jurisdiction of circuit court to hear appeals from final judgments in misdemeanor cases.
Title
Jurisdiction of Appellate Courts
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 2 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1510 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1392 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-61
S1392 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-61
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |