FL H7047 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 208 (Ch. 2013-7)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 208 (Ch. 2013-7)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates Federal Grants Trust Fund within DEO modification; repeals provisions relating to termination of trust fund, to conform.
Title
Federal Grants Trust Fund/DEO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 208 (Ch. 2013-7) |
2013-03-21 | House | Substituted SB 208 |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13 |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0208 (Same As) 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-7
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7047 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7047/BillText/Filed/PDF |