FL H7045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 8 (Ch. 2019-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 8 (Ch. 2019-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conforms Florida Statutes to directive of Legislature in s. 9, ch. 2012-116, LOF, codified as s. 11.242(5)(j), F.S., to prepare reviser's bill to omit all statutes & laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority.
Title
Florida Statutes/Rulemaking Repeals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 8 (Ch. 2019-5) |
2019-03-20 | House | Substituted SB 8 |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S8 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Chapter No. 2019-5
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
252 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 939 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
260 | 0144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 0572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 29545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7045 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7045/BillText/Filed/PDF |