FL H7039 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements relating to district school board duties & responsibilities, requirements for student management of specified health conditions, prekindergarten instructors postsecondary educator preparation in field experiences, Florida Institute for Charter School Innovation, critical teacher shortages, collective bargaining, Teacher Apprenticeship Program, Dale Hickam Excellent Teaching Program, FCS institution employment equity accountability program, rent or lease of K-12 plants & facilities.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Education Quality Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Education Quality Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002 |
2024-02-27 | House | Substituted CS/SB 7002 |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2024-01-19 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-16 | House | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee |
2024-01-12 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1045 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
H1285 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Chapter No. 2024-101
S994 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
S7000 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
S7002 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S996 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1285
S200 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
S728 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
H1285 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Chapter No. 2024-101
S994 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
S7000 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
S7002 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S996 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1285
S200 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
S728 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 372 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 6202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 2315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |