FL H7039 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers; revises designations in specified county.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1100 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#829 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#801 (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#829 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#801 (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1142 | |
2012-03-06 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (317754) -HJ 1138 | |
2012-03-01 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 713 | |
2012-02-29 | Withdrawn from Transportation; Community Affairs -SJ 709 | |
2012-02-24 | Received -SJ 683 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 754 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 753 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 702 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-20 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-16 | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 686 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -HJ 220 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 236 | |
2012-01-13 | Filed |